ELLENOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ellenor's provides & coordinates the best personalised care for all ages, sharing our expertise to ensure that all families facing terminal illness get the right support in the best place possible, enabling them to make the most of the time they have. Providing Specialist Palliative Care and Hospice Care for adults and children. Raising awareness of end of life issues and promoting good practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,209,780
Donations and legacies | £3.40m | |
Charitable activities | £2.42m | |
Other trading activities | £2.26m | |
Investments | £62.20k | |
Other | £66.80k |
Total expenditure:
£7,809,224
Raising funds | £1.81m | |
Charitable activities | £5.99m | |
Other | £8.88k |
£557 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,276,252 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.82m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.99m | |
Retained for future use | £400.56k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.82m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.99m | |
Retained for future use | £401.11k |
People

154 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
265 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 09 November 2007: Standard registration
- 27 February 2023: Funds received from 1051669 MEOPHAM WELFARE COMMITTEE
- ELLENOR (Working name)
- ELLENORLIONS CHYPS (Working name)
- ELLENORLIONS HOSPICES (Working name)
- ELLENOR LIONS HOSPICES (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Makahn Singh Cheema | Chair | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Temilade Aina | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Barnett | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Baker | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hawkins | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Geoffrey Holt | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Constance Jeans | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Urquhart Griffiths | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Atwal | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shamminder Singu Bedi | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.49m | £10.31m | £13.40m | £7.91m | £8.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.92m | £6.78m | £7.23m | £7.15m | £7.81m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.71m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £156.42k | £2.28m | £6.22m | £2.14m | £2.28m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.75m | £3.84m | £4.58m | £3.32m | £3.40m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.25m | £1.11m | £2.11m | £2.29m | £2.26m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.01m | £2.37m | £2.19m | £2.20m | £2.42m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £147.41k | £30.55k | £48.41k | £67.21k | £62.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £324.61k | £2.97m | £4.47m | £41.55k | £66.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £846.16k | £2.17m | £3.03m | £1.75m | £1.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.83m | £5.06m | £5.41m | £5.46m | £5.99m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.08m | £1.72m | £1.80m | £1.68m | £1.81m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £61.31k | £64.64k | £80.51k | £84.16k | £97.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.81k | £9.59k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.81k | £0 | £15.79k | £20.17k | £8.88k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.10m | £2.91m | £2.75m | £2.65m | £2.56m | |
|
Long-term investments | £566.57k | £567.01k | £1.51m | £1.55m | £1.27m | |
|
Other assets | £3.97m | £7.60m | £14.85m | £15.96m | £14.84m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £654.58k | £556.27k | £2.33m | £2.58m | £681.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 4 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND SICKNESS AND THE TREATMENT OF ILLNESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME O TIME THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THIS OBJECT): 1.1 TO PROMOTE THE CARE, WITHOUT LIMITATIONS WITH REGARD TO COLOUR, RACE, RELIGION OR SIMILAR BELIEF, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGIN, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER REASSIGNMENT, AGE, MARITAL STATUS OR DISABILITY OF PERSONS WITH LIFE-LIMITING OR LIFE-THREATENING CONDITIONS WHETHER IN HOSPICES, HOSPITALS, NURSING HOMES, CLINICS OR THEIR OWN HOMES AND TO PROVIDE MEDICAL, NURSING AND OTHER TREATMENT AND ATTENTION ACCORDING TO THEIR NEEDS, TOGETHER WITH GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE FOR THOSE CARING FOR THEM; 1.2 TO CONDUCT, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUFFERERS FROM ANY ILLNESS, DISABILITY, DISEASE, HANDICAP OR INFIRMITY, AND IN PARTICULAR LIFE-LIMITING OR LIFE-THREATENING CONDITIONS, TO MAKE PUBLICLY AVAILABLE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH (BY WHATEVER MEANS) AND TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST IN THE TEACHING AND TRAINING OF DOCTORS, NURSES, PHYSIOTHERAPISTS, PSYCHOLOGISTS AND OTHER PERSONS ENGAGED IN THE CARE OF SUCH SUFFERERS. 2 TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CONDITIONS OF SEVERE OR PROLONGED SCHECK OR DEPRESSION ARISING FROM BEREAVEMENT, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING FOR THE FAMILY, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF THOSE WHO HAVE DIED AFTER SUFFERING FROM TERMINAL ILLNESS OR INTRACTABLE PAIN..
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ellenor
Coldharbour Road
Northfleet
GRAVESEND
DA11 7HQ
- Phone:
- 01474320007
- Email:
- info@ellenor.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window