Financial history SOLIHULL SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1120597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £24.25m £20.51m £21.28m £22.71m £26.23m
Total expenditure £18.24m £19.89m £21.41m £22.64m £24.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £413.40k £147.80k £196 £60.22k £69.72k
Income - Donations and legacies £965.92k £218.74k £477.98k £301.01k £1.98m
Income - Other trading activities £1.23m £721.71k £801.18k £921.33k £1.08m
Income - Charitable activities £14.64m £18.45m £18.78m £20.17m £21.87m
Income - Endowments £215.92k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.22m £1.12m £1.22m £1.32m £1.29m
Income - Other £6.19m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £750.00k £0 £0 £0 £1.71m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.06m £19.71m £21.17m £22.42m £23.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £185.03k £178.45k £233.89k £227.67k £209.47k
Expenditure - Governance £211.89k £145.59k £129.36k £114.61k £127.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £825 £925 £1.25k £1.35k £1.43k
Expenditure - Investment management £185.03k £130.63k £182.41k £146.14k £191.11k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0