HEALTH ACTION LEICESTER FOR ETHIOPIA (HALE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Partnership projects between health professionals in UK (primarily Leicester) and in Gondar, Ethiopia. Including mental health, nursing, clinial audit, surgery training etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 13 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Anthony Power | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurence David Wicks | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alwyn Abraham | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor John Seymour Heslop-Harrison | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEMMELL CHARLES MILLS | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL SILVERMAN | Trustee | 16 April 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.66k | £6.30k | £8.06k | £1.17k | £151 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.63k | £11.26k | £10.06k | £3.80k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE HEALTH IN ETHIOPIA BY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THE BUILDING OF SUSTAINABLE PROFESSIONAL AND MANAGERIAL CAPACITY WITHIN THE HEALTH SYSTEMS OF GONDAR. 2) TO FACILITATE LEARNING AND ENHANCE SKILLS FOR ALL MEMBERS OF THE HEALTH CARE COMMUNITY IN GONDAR. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UK HEALTH PROFESSIONALS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH PROFESSIONALS IN A DEVELOPING COUNTRY THEREBY ENHANCING THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF GLOBAL HEALTH ISSUES AND ENABLING PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN CLINICAL PRACTICE, IN MANAGEMENT SKILLS AND IN TEACHING, LEARNING AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 HIGH ACRES
BILLESDON
LEICESTER
LE7 9FB
- Phone:
- 01162596975
- Email:
- millseight@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window