THE SANDYACRES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A To provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the condtions of life B To establish or secure the establishment of a community centre at Sandyacres, Ashford and manage and maintain the same in furtherence of the objects of the Trust C To promote such other charitable purposes as may from time to time be determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 February 2024
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 15 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WINSTON MICHAEL | Chair | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
Larry William Krause | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Ernest Alfred Warren | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anton Richard Banham | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Fred Dunkerley | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
JASON MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/02/2020 | 02/02/2021 | 02/02/2022 | 02/02/2023 | 02/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.40k | £31.44k | £10.60k | £3.60k | £24.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.05k | £22.88k | £18.00k | £5.46k | £4.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.10k | £10.60k | N/A | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 February 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 February 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 February 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 February 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 February 2020 | 20 December 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 2 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
A TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GOAT LEES AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AT SANDYACRES, ASHFORD, KENT AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; C TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
GOAT LEES AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS AND SANDYACRES, ASHFORD, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Dexter Close
Kennington
Ashford
TN25 4QG
- Phone:
- 01233636644
- Email:
- 2001BUSONE43@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window