THE COMEDY SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity through the medium of comedy provides funds and facilities, for producing sketches in schools mainly in the Greater London area, highlighting the dangers and illegality of carrying knives, and for training in social, life and communication skills in mental health institutions, prisons,and gangland, and for carrying out the objects of the Trust Deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Kent
- North Yorkshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr D Babu OBE | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Mr K A Chapman | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr P R Randall MBE | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MS J JACOB | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MS A F NOAKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR N R MULLARKEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.46k | £16.98k | £9.62k | £12.85k | £13.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.41k | £16.33k | £12.71k | £12.78k | £966 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JULY 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR AT RISK OF EXCLUSION OR WHO HAVE OFFENDED OR ARE AT RISK OF OFFENDING BY USING COMEDY AS A TOOL TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN SOCIAL AND LIFE SKILLS AND RESPONSIBLE CITIZENSHIP AND BY ESTABLISHING A MENTORING PROGRAMME TO PROVIDE GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT SO AS TO ASSIST IN THEIR REHABILITATION AND SETTLEMENT IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14-15 GLOUCESTER GATE
LONDON
NW1 4HG
- Phone:
- 02074861844
- Email:
- email@thecomedyschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window