ELECTRIC STORM YOUTH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide recreational and leisure time activities and support which aims to develop skills, capacities and capabilities to enable young people to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals. The charity will be promoting education and looking for ways to relieve unemployment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £8,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARION PESKETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sophie Kerr | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ayling | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Sylvia Knight | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOY HARTLEY | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR DAVID JOHN PESKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ian Lloyd Tout | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.53k | £133.38k | £209.16k | £119.63k | £141.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.65k | £122.60k | £149.33k | £151.01k | £171.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.12k | £10.48k | £8.00k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. I) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; II) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN OR NEAR ADUR, WORTHING, OR THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: C) ADVANCING LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; D) ADVANCING EDUCATION; E) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; F) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ADUR, WORTHING, THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 SEASIDE AVENUE
LANCING
BN15 8BY
- Phone:
- 07963914613
- Email:
- electricstormyouth@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window