ARCHDIOCESE OF ORTHODOX PARISHES OF RUSSIAN TRADITION IN WESTERN EUROPE-EXARCHATE OF THE ECUMENICAL PATRIARCHATE-DEANERY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The pastoral care and episcopal oversight of the parishes and communities in Great Britain and Ireland which adhere to the Archdiocese of Orthodox Parishes of Russian Tradition in Western Europe under the Ecumenical Patriarchate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 May 2008: Standard registration
- 25 September 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 September 2017: Funds transferred to 1164976 THE EXARCHATE UK DEANERY
- DEANERY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Working name)
- THE EPISCOPAL VICARIATE OF ORTHODOX PARISHES OF RUSSIAN TRADITION IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.93k | £38.34k | £37.24k | £43.05k | £47.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.69k | £39.48k | £39.00k | £49.59k | £36.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 05 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 05 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 04 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 04 October 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MAY 2008, AS AMENDED 18 OCT 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF CHURCH GOVERNMENT ACCEPTED BY THE VICARIATE IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND. THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH SHALL MEAN THE FAITH OF THE ONE HOLY ORTHODOX - CATHOLIC AND APOSTOLIC CHURCH, ROOTED IN THE HOLY TRADITION, AND TAUGHT BY THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, THE SEVEN ECUMENICAL COUNCILS AND THE LOCAL AND PROVINCIAL COUNCILS, AND BY THE HOLY FATHERS, AND AS PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE CHURCHES OF THE FOUR ANCIENT PATRIARCHATES OF CONSTANTINOPLE JERUSALEM ANTIOCH AND ALEXANDRIA AND BY THE CHURCHES NOW IN COMMUNION WITH ANY OR ALL OF THEM.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window