Trustees LUTON CULTURAL SERVICES TRUST
Charity number: 1122964
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Safeer Ahmed | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Bilal Hussain | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joanne Elizabeth Read | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Julma Begum | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Carlota Larrea | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
SUFIAN SADIQ | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Robert Smalley | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Andrea Goddard Stark | Trustee | 15 December 1992 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANDREW STRANGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
NICK GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.