LEICESTERSHIRE CRICKET CLUB FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop and support activity that uses cricket as the vehicle to: - promote and foster social/community cohesion - tackles inequalities that are prevalent amongst the diverse communities of Leicester and Leicestershire and Rutland. - further educational attainment and training opportunities with a view to developing employability skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 23 July 2008: Standard registration
- 20 February 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1207043 LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND CRICKET FOUNDATION
- LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND CRICKET FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- LEICESTERSHIRE YOUNG CRICKETERS EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- LEICESTERSHIRE YOUNG CRICKETORS EDUCATIN TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £9.55k | £7.15k | £7.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £45 | £60 | £4.79k | £2 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 October 2021 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 DECEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2016 as amended on 03 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CRICKET AND OTHER GAMES AND SPORTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF YOUNG PERSONS IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO ADVANCE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET AND OTHER GAMES AND SPORTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window