GRATIA INTERNATIONAL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was consolidating its position and seeking donors during the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nigeria
Governance
- 14 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Knight | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rory Knight | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.59k | £67.15k | £19.55k | £42.19k | £5.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.64k | £32.53k | £23.21k | £26.67k | £19.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED 5 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR COMMUNITY POVERTY RELIEF PROJECTS, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES; AND THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGH OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE, RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE AND PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS. ALL THIS SHALL BE DONE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, BUT WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD RECTORY
ROWLEIGH LANE
BESSELSLEIGH
ABINGDON
OX13 5QA
- Phone:
- 01344620738
- Email:
- info@gratiainternational.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window