THE SAINSBURY VETERANS WELFARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to relieve need amongst Sainsbury Veterans and former Sainsbury employees. Assistance is provided through the provision of physical aids, respite care and convalesence care. In the year 10 grants were made. The charity aims to reach as many potential beneficiaries as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Clapham | Chair | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lowe | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Graham | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Dick | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas George Parkin | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|||||
John McKinnell Padgett | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY MARTIN STRAKER | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.00k | £32.55k | £4.53k | £57.16k | £40.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.19k | £19.14k | £9.32k | £16.30k | £18.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 11 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 25 JUNE 2008 as amended on 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE NEED AMONGST FORMER SAINSBURY EMPLOYEES WHO ARE VETERANS 2 TO RELIEVE NEED AMONGST THE SPOUSES AND PARTNERS OF FORMER SAINSBURY EMPLOYEES WHO ARE VETERANS 3 TO RELIEVE NEED AMONGST SURVIVING SPOUSES AND PARTNERS OF FORMER SAINSBURY EMPLOYEES WHO WERE VETERANS HAVING GIVEN PRIORITY FIRST TO THE BENEFICIARIES IN 1 TO 3, THEN: 4 TO RELIEVE NEED AMONGST FORMER SAINSBURY EMPLOYEES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE OBJECTS 'VETERANS' ARE THE SAINSBURY COMPANY VETERANS DESCRIBED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS DEED
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Heritage Hill
Keston
BR2 6AU
- Phone:
- 01689861713
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window