THE ORGANISATION OF SIERRA LEONEAN HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS ABROAD (TOSHPA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching nursing students in Sierra Leone. TOSHPA members attended the Commonwealth 2-days Health is Wealth conference in London and implemented it in UK and Sierra Leone.. Collaborative work with other Diaspora organisations to send equipments to nursing schools Fundraising activities Capacity building activities for TOSHPA members in UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 30 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIMI KONAH KATUMU ROGERS | Chair | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEMOH ROGERS | Trustee | 01 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH FALEY | Trustee | 01 May 2007 |
|
|||||
HAWA TURAY | Trustee | 01 May 2007 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.47k | £9.35k | £8.48k | £8.46k | £39.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.27k | £6.55k | £8.12k | £5.44k | £23.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 3 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SIERRA LEONE, BY SENDING VOLUNTEERS TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE AND PROVIDING SUPPORT AND EQUIPMENT TO HEALTH SERVICES.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE,
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Orchard House
Orchard park
Cambridge
CB4 2AD
- Phone:
- 07472361286
- Email:
- info@toshpa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window