Financial history CHENNAI CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1122261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.49k £3.06k £550 £0 £950
Total expenditure £55 £0 £50 £2.97k £3.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A