THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable objective is to provide support by way of grants to the members of the Professional Golfers' Association who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Australia
- Germany
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Sweden
- Switzerland
Governance
- 06 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul McEvoy | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Alexander Crew MBE | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|||||
ALAN WHITE | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.08k | £77.82k | £56.85k | £147.70k | £137.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.66k | £94.33k | £127.90k | £128.01k | £112.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 DECEMBER 2007 AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION 30 DECEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS ASSOCIATION LIMITED WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS ASS
NATIONAL HEADQUARTERS
CENTENARY HOUSE
THE BELFRY
SUTTON COLDFIELD
WEST MID
- Phone:
- 01675470333
- Email:
- david.wright@pga.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window