Financial history BARNET U3A

Charity number: 1129309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £63.52k £48.34k £84.19k £101.88k £116.51k
Total expenditure £56.02k £57.80k £89.47k £93.53k £108.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A