EYAM SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of sport and recreation facilities for Eyam village and surrounding area. The village has a cricket field, pavilion, football pitch, a children's play area, a multi use games area and a cycling pump track.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 17 April 2008: Standard registration
- EYAM SPORTS ASSOCIATION LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Killingley | Chair | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jonathan Roger Wilson Brook | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Davina Ripton | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Wilson Eades | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jamie Frederick Moore | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Emmanuel Belivanis | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Hadfield | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Nicholls | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.37k | £12.40k | £14.95k | £34.10k | £29.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.88k | £20.40k | £9.41k | £30.93k | £21.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 17 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EYAM, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR HE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
EYAM, DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mechanics Institute
Church Street
Eyam
S32 5QH
- Phone:
- 07753 201658
- Email:
- davinaripton@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window