THOMAS'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thomas's Fund provides music therapy in Northamptonshire for children with life limiting illnesses(are unlikely to reach adulthood) or a disablilty who for medical reasons are too ill to attend school for extended periods. This enables access to a creative outlet for physical and emotional self-expression, communication and social interaction. Pre-school children are assessed individually.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 March 2008: Standard registration
- 17 August 2023: Funds received from 1156646 ALFE'S CAUSE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET ELIZABETH HALL | Chair | 12 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
Jay Lucas | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Featherstone | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||
PAUL PARKER | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROS WOODING | Trustee | 12 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
CINDY BAYLIS | Trustee | 12 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
LAURA HELEN CLARKE | Trustee | 12 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
LUCY CATHERINE SMITH | Trustee | 12 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE TOLLAN | Trustee | 12 February 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.04k | £102.53k | £69.49k | £144.85k | £94.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.57k | £83.23k | £83.87k | £97.51k | £95.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/02/2008 as amended on 17 Apr 2024 as amended on 17 Apr 2024 as amended on 17 Apr 2024 as amended on 22 May 2024 as amended on 17 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
To benefit the public through the provision of Music Therapy, to support children/young people’s development; preserve and protect good health and enrich the lives and experiences of the most vulnerable children/young people (aged 0 to 19yrs) in Northamptonshire, who have a life-limiting or life-threatening diagnosis or disability with multiple complex needs resulting, for medical reasons, in being unable to attend school (or an Early Years setting) for prolonged periods, often leaving them isolated.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Poplar Street
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN8 4PL
- Phone:
- 07395962072
- Email:
- jan.hall@thomassfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window