UPS AND DOWNS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ups 'n' Downs is a support group dedicated to helping families and individuals in East Northamptonshire affected by Down's syndrome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Hindwood | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Hoefling | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIAN Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annette Murkitt | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Faye Hoefling | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Whitehead | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adele Rees | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Hipkiss | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Tate | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kay Sammon | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|||||
TRACEY SMITH | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MAI SMITH | Trustee | 10 April 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.78k | £55.23k | £45.02k | £38.47k | £38.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.75k | £51.66k | £41.87k | £58.50k | £68.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN, ADULTS AND FAMILIES AFFECTED BY DOWN'S SYNDROME BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND RECREATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DOWN'S SYNDROME.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORTHAMPTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Cranford Road
Barton Seagrave
KETTERING
Northamptonshire
NN15 6RJ
- Phone:
- 07817735204
- Email:
- info@upsndowns.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window