Financial history KING'S CHURCH IN GREATER MANCHESTER

Charity number: 1122900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.18m £857.56k £924.55k £1.23m £1.54m
Total expenditure £1.16m £837.32k £917.87k £1.11m £799.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.76k £1.50k N/A £11.39k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £610.64k £585.32k £589.93k £570.74k £659.50k
Income - Other trading activities £424.95k £104.61k £303.73k £643.44k £863.87k
Income - Charitable activities £80.16k £70.56k £29.32k £6.51k £6.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £134 £10 £43 £691 £1.47k
Income - Other £63.03k £97.07k £1.53k £3.95k £9.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £677.32k £597.79k £684.25k £701.32k £47.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £486.78k £239.53k £233.63k £404.12k £752.91k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £9.78k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0