SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECTS

Charity number: 1123689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY ACHIEVES ITS OBJECTIVES IN FOUR WAYS: BY PAYING SCHOOL FEES FOR CHILDREN WHERE THEIR FAMILIES CANNOT AFFORD THE FEES; BY FUNDING BUILDING PROJECTS AT SCHOOLS; BY PROVIDING COMPUTERS, FABRIC AND OTHER TEACHING MATERIALS; BY ENCOURAGING VOLUNTEERS TO VISIT ESWATINI AND WORK AT ONE OF THE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATED WITH THE CHARITY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £40,115
Total expenditure: £43,670

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Eswatini

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2008: Standard registration
  • 11 January 2020: Funds received from 1126348 CHANGING FUTURES
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH FOSSEY Chair
SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECTS
Received: On time
Barry Keith Clarke Trustee 09 March 2024
SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECTS
Received: On time
Harry Jay Woodrow Trustee 09 March 2024
None on record
Ian Robert James Nicholls Trustee 11 March 2023
SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECTS
Received: On time
Silke Brittain Trustee 23 October 2021
SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECTS
Received: On time
Stephen Graham Smith Trustee 25 October 2019
ROTARY CLUB OF THE NORTH COTSWOLDS TRUST FUND
Received: On time
ASSISTING BERKSHIRE CHILDREN TO READ
Received: On time
SHIPTON READING ROOM
Received: On time
CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND, GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIO
Received: On time
SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECTS
Received: On time
Lucy Millar Trustee 05 October 2018
None on record
ROBERT THOMPSON Trustee 30 March 2014
EARLY CHILDHOOD PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
THE REVD MATTHEW JAMES LAWSON Trustee
SWAZILAND SCHOOLS PROJECTS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £50.68k £43.20k £65.69k £39.35k £40.12k
Total expenditure £48.33k £40.99k £65.97k £42.71k £43.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 BINDON ABBEY
BEDFORD
MK41 0AZ
Phone:
07768515950