THE RAW FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention/relief of poverty anywhere in the world; The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation within disadvantaged communities, the provision of facilities for playing Association Football or other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare for recreation; Relief of financial hardship, either generally or individually of people ; Other charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Middlesbrough
- Stockton-on-tees
- Australia
- Brazil
- France
- Poland
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 14 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL ANDREW CARLILE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Neil Flint | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV Andrew Bowerman | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lovegrove | Trustee |
|
||||||
WAYNE ROBERT WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.41k | £144.49k | £23.77k | £61.00k | £10.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.46k | £151.99k | £30.78k | £25.44k | £100.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 January 2025 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 July 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 3 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY: . PROMOTING AND PROTECTING GOOD HEALTH . RAISING AWARENESS OF HIV/AIDS TO COMMUNITIES AT RISK ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND STRENGTHENING COMMUNITY INITIATIVES .WORKING WITH LIKE MINDED DEVELOPMENTAL ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITABLE BODIES TO ACHIEVE THESE AIMS 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 4 OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Exchange Building
66 Church Street
Hartlepool
Hartlepool
Select
TS16 0RB
- Phone:
- 01642780565
- Email:
- info@lionsraw.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window