Trustees THE ROYAL SIGNALS MUSEUM
Charity Number: 1133304

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip James Davies | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Victor John Brannigan | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Alicia L M Jarman | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Michelle Forster | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca S Jacques-Grey | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Bruce | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JEAN JONES | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward M Flint | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane M Stockdale | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ARCHIBALD COLIN CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.