ESSEX ATHLETE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF FINANCIAL GRANTS AND BURSARIES SUPPORT FOR OTHER CHARITIES WORKING WITH YOUNG PEOPLE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 25 April 2008: Standard registration
- 04 March 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.13k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2025 | 717 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2025 | 1082 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1564 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1564 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1 IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES OR FUNDS WHICH ENABLE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX (WHICH FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS TRUST INCLUDE THE TWELVE DISTRICT AND BOROUGH COUNCILS OF ESSEX COUNTY COUNCIL AND THE UNITARY AUTHORITIES OF SOUTHEND ON SEA AND THURROCK) TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE YOUNG PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE PROVIDED AND WHOM BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE SUCH NEED 2 TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ESSEX THROUGH THEIR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY IMPROVE 3 PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ESSEX BY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL EDUCATION 4 TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES UNDER ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window