SHAW MEADES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pay or apply income with power in their absolute discretion from time to time to pay or apply the whole or any part or parts of the capital to or for the benefit of all or such one or more of the charities in such shares if more than one and in such manner as the trustees shall from time to time in their absolute discretion think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.05k | £4.62k | £8.07k | £5.10k | £6.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.48k | £5.56k | £22.08k | £17.50k | £14.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL AND CERTIFICATE OF PROBATE GRANTED 23 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE SHAW-MEADES CHARITABLE TRUST WITH POWER IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME TO PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE SHAW-MEADES CHARITABLE TRUST TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL OR SUCH ONE OR MORE OF THE CHARITIES (AS HEREINAFTER DEFINED) IN SUCH SHARES IF MORE THAN ONE AND IN SUCH MANNER AS MY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. - FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, PLEASE SEE WILL
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HSBC Trust Company (UK) Limited
Forum 1, 2nd Floor
The Forum, Parkway,Whiteley
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO15 7PA
- Phone:
- 02380 722525
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window