THE HIGHLANDS SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1123133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising and donations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,252
Total expenditure: £120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Enfield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DELYTH ROSAMUND RAMSDEN Trustee 08 December 2015
None on record
STEPHEN DAVID WAY Trustee 09 December 2014
THE LATYMER FOUNDATION AT EDMONTON
Received: On time
NORTH LONDON SCOUT DISTRICT
Received: On time
KEITH PHILIP CARRANO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.93k £3.36k £26.78k £4.50k £1.25k
Total expenditure £162 £162 £24.33k £18.88k £120
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 March 2023 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Highlands School
148 Worlds End Lane
London
N21 1QQ
Phone:
02083701100
Website:

No information available