Accounts and annual returns KENTDALE DISTRICT SCOUTS

Charity number: 1123330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 May 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 May 2024 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required