Trustees KENTDALE DISTRICT SCOUTS
Charity number: 1123330

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel William Telford Coates | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Anne Prickett | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Barry McLeod | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Hubbard | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger John Downing | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Susan Coates | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
TIM KEEGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD HIRST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BILL DAVISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA BOWDEN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.