CRANHAM COMMON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objectives are to raise funds to purchase the open common land in Cranham (some 70acres).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Louise Daniels | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillipa Rose Mackie Saunders | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Anne Chilcott | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Harry Ian Overs | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY WILLIAM OSBORNE | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Peter John Elliott | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Drake | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rushbrooke Bass | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Theodore Tyson | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Beryl Dorothy Berry | Trustee | 19 September 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.23k | £4.32k | £2.11k | £2.13k | £2.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £1.01k | £946 | £2.73k | £765 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 2008 as amended on 23 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE, OWN AND MANAGE CRANHAM COMMON AS OPEN GRASSLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF CRANHAM AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Wiggin Osborne Fullerlove
95 Promenade
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL50 1HH
- Phone:
- 01242 710206
- Email:
- cranhamcommontrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window