MILLMEAD FINANCIAL LIFEBOAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The assistance of specifically identified individuals or families within Guildford Baptist Church who are in a significant dept crisis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esther Faith Matthews | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Nigel Mansfield | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Carol Elizabeth Hodkinson | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev Karen Case-Green | Trustee | 31 December 2017 |
|
|||||||
David Subadha | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
Ian Stackhouse | Trustee |
|
||||||||
LANCE GUY REDMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £17.99k | £13.11k | £7.04k | £18.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.13k | £29.57k | £11.45k | £28.69k | £22.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 11 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"). TO ASSIST SPECIFICALLY IDENTIFIED INDIVIDUALS/FAMILIES WITHIN GUILDFORD BAPTIST CHURCH WHO ARE IN, OR IN THE IMMEDIATE FUTURE FACE, A SIGNIFICANT DEBT CRISIS OR OTHER SIGNIFICANT FINANCIAL NEEDS. A DEFINITION OF A DEBT CRISIS FOR THIS SCHEME'S PURPOSES WOULD INCLUDE, BUT NOT BE RESTRICTED TO, THOSE FACING BANKRUPTCY OR A POTENTIAL HOUSE REPOSSESSION ORDER WITH AN ASSOCIATED INCREASING DIFFICULTY TO FEED AND CLOTHE THEMSELVES AND/OR THEIR FAMILY. ONLY: A, -CHURCH MEMBERS B - REGULAR ATTENDERS WITH ACTIVE INVOLVEMENT IN THE FELLOWSHIP C. OTHERS WITH A CONNECTION WITH THE GUILDFORD BAPTIST CHURCH WILL QUALIFY FOR ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURY FIELDS
GUILDFORD
GU2 4AZ
- Phone:
- 01483575008
- Email:
- office@guildfordbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window