CWM TAF MORGANNWG MIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Merthyr and the Valleys Mind are a local charity affiliated to National Mind. We provide a range of quality services to adults who experience mental or emotional distress. The services include community and hospital advocacy, resource centres that provide dropin facilities, counselling, training and a range of groups e.g. depression, self-help, gardening, relaxation, IT and music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £187,136 from 4 government contract(s) and £187,136 from 4 government grant(s)
People

36 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 12 April 2008: Standard registration
- MERTHYR AND THE VALLEYS MIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR CLIVE THOMAS JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dai Price | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Smith | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Whitfield-Williams | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Diment | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynnette Thomas | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Hayden Trewartha | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Markham | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Michelle Thomas | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|||||
GERWYN BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.05m | £1.28m | £1.84m | £1.49m | £1.14m | |
|
Total expenditure | £919.16k | £1.10m | £1.46m | £1.32m | £1.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £293.67k | £367.72k | £518.10k | £637.15k | £187.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | £275.71k | £354.92k | £434.89k | £842.62k | £187.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £181.82k | £179.16k | £206.57k | £84.38k | £7.43k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.27k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £825.97k | £1.07m | £1.63m | £12.09k | £137.11k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.48k | £5.77k | £2.09k | £3.25k | £12.19k | |
|
Income - Other | £36.12k | £29.50k | £0 | £1.39m | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £919.16k | £1.10m | £1.39m | £437.52k | £1.36m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £27.78k | £390.25k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.64k | £8.01k | £9.41k | £0 | £9.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £36.75k | £496.11k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.79k | £6.36k | £6.12k | £4.92k | £1.47k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £710.39k | £986.87k | £1.49m | £1.43m | £1.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £68.77k | £163.36k | £279.04k | £109.75k | £57.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2015 as amended on 13 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF MIND.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 High Street
MERTHYR TYDFIL
Mid Glamorgan
CF47 8UG
- Phone:
- 01685707480
- Email:
- info@ctmmind.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window