VOLUNTEER CENTRE MERTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support volunteering in Merton and surrounding areas: Marketing and raising profile of volunteering; Managing volunteer recruitment programmes; Provide support services for volunteers and organisations deploying volunteers to ensure good practice and develop volunteering opportunities; Supporting inclusion of disabled people, unemployed, young people and disadvantaged through volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 November 2008: Standard registration
- 21 July 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 21 July 2014: Funds transferred to 1085867 MERTON VOLUNTARY SERVICE COUNCIL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £391.79k | £468.78k | £406.33k | £380.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £366.56k | £454.62k | £390.28k | £396.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 08 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 08 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 08 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 08 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 19 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 19 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE AND UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK AND ACTIVITIES TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, HEALTH, SOCIAL SERVICES, COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, CULTURE, SPORT, ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT AND FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF MERTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES; TO RECRUIT, ADVISE, GUIDE AND PROVIDE CENTRAL INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR PERSONS WILLING TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY SERVICE AND ACTIVITIES TO ADVISE GUIDE AND PROVIDE A CENTRAL INFORMATION SERVICE AND RECRUITING AGENCY FOR ORGANISATIONS USING VOLUNTEERS, PARTICULARLY THOSE BEING MEMBERS OF THE CENTER.
Area of benefit
MERTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window