HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE CHILDREN'S UNIVERSITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1124329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of and to provide care facilities of children of school age via the provision of recreational and leisure time activities in the interests of social welfare and thereby to improve the conditions of their lives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • Kingston Upon Hull City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE HULL C.U. LTD (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD FIELD Chair
None on record
Susan Johns Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Leigh Cathryn Hudson Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Wendy Newman Trustee 16 July 2019
None on record
RUTH MARIE TRUELOVE Trustee 26 February 2014
None on record
ANITA FOY Trustee 12 March 2013
None on record
ANDREW GARY HOLMES Trustee 02 October 2012
None on record
Janet Adamson Trustee 15 December 2011
TEETH TEAM LIMITED
Received: On time
ARTLINK CENTRE FOR COMMUNITY ARTS
Received: On time
HULL SCRAPSTORE
Received: On time
RONALD WILLIAM DICKINSON Trustee 15 December 2011
None on record
MIKE JACKSON Trustee 25 July 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £467.67k £571.96k £659.59k £698.65k £2.25m
Total expenditure £467.60k £573.59k £643.74k £658.75k £1.45m
Income from government contracts £34.83k £34.82k £64.66k N/A £131.95k
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £80.86k £95.62k £51.67k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £391.11k £456.27k £499.50k £1.67m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £24.64k £5.30k £74.76k £173.73k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £155.74k £127.03k £115.17k £398.68k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £476 £138 £27 £415
Income - Other N/A £0 £70.86k £9.19k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £507.70k £633.14k £640.91k £1.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £61.48k £6.74k £13.84k £55.68k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.56k £1.62k £1.80k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £4.42k £3.86k £3.99k £7.68k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets N/A £4.13k £2.77k £42.90k £13.39k
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A £403.21k £384.35k £394.60k £1.26m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £117.82k £81.75k £92.23k £136.47k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hull and East Yorkshire Children's University
Swale House
246 Cottingham Road
HULL
HU6 7RS
Phone:
01482 466045