Financial history FRUITVOX

Charity Number: 1124175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.42k £5.58k £4.79k £187 £429
Total expenditure £3.76k £2.56k £5.23k £10.12k £10.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A