Trustees ACADEMY OF MEDICAL EDUCATORS

Charity number: 1128988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Dhivya Pownraj Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Dr Thomas Rourke Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Dr Hiro Khoshnaw Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Dr Martin Paul Hawes Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Dr Navneet Singh Kandhari Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Dr Enjy Abouzeid Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Dr Linda Elaine Prescott-Clements Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Dr Jhiamluka Zservando Solano Velasquez Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Dr James Robert Fisher Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Dr Philip Xiu Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Professor Colin Francis Macdougall Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Dr Jennifer Conlan Trustee 27 March 2023
None on record
Dr Lisa-Jayne Ann Edwards Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Dr Russell Peek Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Professor Harish Kumar Thampy Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Professor Mohamed Elhassan Abdalla Elsayed Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Dr Claire Joanne Stocker Trustee 28 April 2020
None on record
Professor Paul Baker Trustee 21 March 2017
None on record
Professor Aidan Byrne Trustee 06 April 2016
None on record
Professor James Michael Read Trustee 26 February 2015
THE FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL PUBLISHING
Received: On time
Dr Nicolas Cooper Trustee 12 February 2014
None on record
Julie Browne FACADMED Trustee 23 October 2012
THE FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL PUBLISHING
Received: On time