Financial history AR - RAJAA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1124162
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.71k £42.15k £27.51k £33.01k £26.92k
Total expenditure £21.90k £62.18k £13.55k £24.68k £56.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A