BISHOP'S CASTLE HOSPITAL EQUIPMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness and to promote and protect good health by providing services over and above that which the NHS provides to Bishop's Castle NHS Community Hospital and to assist the hospital working with its catchment area's six G.P. practices, Integrated Care Team, Nurses, therapists and the area's District Nurses to benefit the hospital's in patients and all members of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 14 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HAROLD ASHWELL | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW EDWARD STELMAN | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|||||
JEAN RICE | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY ALFRED STANTON-MARTIN | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.60k | £67.95k | £12.23k | £26.23k | £47.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.66k | £1.28k | £23.27k | £39.72k | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING OVER AND ABOVE THAT WHICH THE NHS PROVIDES TO BISHOP'S CASTLE NHS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND TO ASSIST THE HOSPITAL WORKING WITH ITS CATCHMENT AREA'S SIX GP PRACTICES, INTEGRATED CARE TEAM, NURSES, THERAPISTS AND THE AREA'S DISTRICT NURSES TO BENEFIT THE HOSPITAL'S IN-PATIENTS AND ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY LIVING IN THE HOSPITAL'S SIX HUNDRED AND FIFTY SQUARE MILE CATCHMENT AREA OF SOUTH WEST SHROPSHIRE AND EASTERN POWYS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH WEST SHROPSHIRE AND EASTERN POWYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amazon Cottage
Chapel Yard
BISHOPS CASTLE
SY9 5DE
- Phone:
- 01588630282
- Email:
- STANTONMARTIN@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window