THE CURRAN FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes. Trustees Do Not accept any unsolicited applications

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £576
Total expenditure: £12,476

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUDLOW TRUST CO LTD Trustee 14 February 2022
THE LOLLIPOP FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ASHLA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BASCOMBE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MRS EDITH ELLEN HARRIS WILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARGARET ROSEMARY HARGRAVE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
STUART MCCONACHIE GAULD AND PAULINE MAY GAULD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STANLEY AND LORNA GRAVES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
NATALIA MARTINEZ Trustee
None on record
GARRETT PAUL CURRAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £2.16k £53.50k £233.29k £20.04k £576
Total expenditure £2.10k £56.26k £235.68k £29.94k £12.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 13 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 10 March 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 10 March 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
0117 313 8200
Website:

No information available