Financial history CHARLTON WITH CROPTHORNE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1124403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £59.56k £70.12k £93.14k £98.39k £120.12k
Total expenditure £69.19k £67.29k £88.24k £86.54k £104.67k
Income from government contracts N/A £48.09k £73.86k £69.61k £85.03k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.24k