SHROPSHIRE RURAL SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Through voluntary and partnership effort, develop and offer support services that meet the needs of those suffering from all forms of stress arising from their rural way of life. 2. Endeavour to make statutory authorities and other pubic bodies aware of the issues giving rise to rural stress, and to offer constructive suggestions on how these issues can be addressed and alleviated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 26 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER Brentnall PEMBERTON | Chair | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Hayley Victoria Price | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Adam Clayton | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Phillip Howell | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Latter | Trustee | 30 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BROWN | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.78k | £11.01k | £18.06k | £33.87k | £40.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.10k | £14.20k | £12.49k | £21.34k | £30.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN RURAL SHROPSHIRE, WHO SUFFER FROM STRESS BY THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, PRACTICAL HELP AND ADVICE 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING PROFESSIONALS, IN THE SIGNIFICANCE OF STRESS IN RURAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
RURAL SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o NFU Mutual
Mutual House
Sitka Drive
Shrewsbury Business Park
SHREWSBURY
SY2 6LG
- Phone:
- 03001232825
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window