Accounts and annual returns SCOTT BOLTON TRUST

Charity number: 1125000
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 July 2024 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required Download Open in new window