Financial history SCOTT BOLTON TRUST

Charity number: 1125000
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £23.13k £23.61k £25.60k £32.02k £33.13k
Total expenditure £41.67k £15.87k £32.50k £49.63k £49.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A