THE TOMLINSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trustees Do Not accept any unsolicited applications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.27k | £194.06k | £337.27k | £348.62k | £383.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.05k | £214.19k | £518.26k | £312.64k | £350.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DATED 19 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME AND, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS IN SUCH MANNER AS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN DOING SO MAY MAKE GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS, FOUNDATION, TRUSTS, INDIVIDUALS AND UNDERTAKINGS, AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window