FOUR CORNERS BOOKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELINOR ROBYN ZOE SAINSBURY | Chair | 15 March 2012 |
|
|||||
Mireille Fauchon | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ines Basille | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Vinter | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.68k | £144.60k | £244.90k | £266.01k | £249.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.41k | £201.40k | £247.17k | £284.45k | £233.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ( THE OBJECTS ) ARE TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE VISUAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
Black Country House
Rounds Green Road
OLDBURY
West Midlands
B69 2DG
- Phone:
- 02072478948
- Email:
- hello@fourcornersbooks.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window