Financial history NSR ROLLING STOCK RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1127895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.92k £17.79k £14.80k £4.18k £5.30k
Total expenditure £30.06k £11.98k £8.55k £6.21k £23.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A