Trustees NSR ROLLING STOCK RESTORATION TRUST
Charity number: 1127895

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Edward Smith BSc MPhil | Chair | 21 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Heath | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Kieron Mark Rigby | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith David Peterson | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Beardmore | Trustee | 19 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVE SCRAGG | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ANTHONY WARREN MD FRCS | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.