THE VACATION TERM FOR BIBLICAL STUDY

Charity number: 1125494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity runs a summer school with a programme of lectures at a high educational level given by scholars who are expert in biblical study, theology and related subjects. Instruction is also provided in biblical Greek and Hebrew at beginner, intermediate and advanced levels. The programme is delivered at a price which compares very favourably with other residential summer schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £29,288
Total expenditure: £32,369

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 August 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr TIMOTHY JOHN WINDER BED PHD Chair
None on record
Proffesor Eryl Wynn Davies Trustee 25 July 2022
THE JOINT COMMITTEE FOR A NEW TRANSLATION OF THE BIBLE INTO WELSH
Received: On time
CALVINISTIC METHODIST OR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF WALES CANDIDATES AND TRAINING DEPARTMENT FUND
Received: On time
Professor Edward Adams Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record
Professor Judith Margaret Lieu Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Rev Richard Wyber Trustee 01 August 2016
TOC H AND ALL HALLOWS TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHARITY FOR LICENSED MINISTERS IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD
Received: On time
Dr JANE DEANNE MCLARTY Trustee 01 July 2016
THE CHARLIE BAYNE TRAVEL TRUST
Received: On time
CORPUSTY AND SAXTHORPE VILLAGE HALL
Received: 25 days late
NICOLA SIAN PITTAM Trustee 05 January 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY BROOKFIELD, LONDON
Received: On time
Janet Marion Cowen Trustee 17 September 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR, CHALK FARM
Recently registered
REVD CANON JOHN RICHARD WESTWOOD Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR MORNA DOROTHY HOOKER MAPHDDLIT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £119.25k £46.46k £31.12k £32.01k £29.29k
Total expenditure £16.51k £31.68k £16.60k £35.61k £32.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 September 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 September 2021 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 March 2021 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 31 March 2021 274 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
96 Hills Road
Saham Hills
THETFORD
Norfolk
IP25 7EZ
Phone:
01953889898
Website:

vtbs.org.uk