THE REUSE CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A furniture reuse charity that provides constructive volunteering opportunities in Bedfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £47,463 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 06 May 2009: Standard registration
- 24 July 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 July 2019: Funds transferred to 801035 IMPAKT HOUSING & SUPPORT
- FURNITURE LINK (Working name)
- FURNITURE LINK BEDFORD LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.84k | £187.58k | £250.81k | £291.94k | £257.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.48k | £178.18k | £219.50k | £293.52k | £266.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £12.50k | £0 | £47.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 13 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
(A1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE AND IMMEDIATE SURROUNDS BY RENOVATING AND SUPPLYING FURNITURE, HOUSEHOLD GOODS AND DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS ON NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (A2) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY; 1. THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS; 2. PARTAKING IN NATIONAL AND COMMUNITY SCHEMES AND PROJECTS FOR RECYCLING AND REUSING MATERIALS, COMPONENTS AND RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE AND IMMEDIATE SURROUNDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window