THE MERCHANT TAYLORS' SCHOOLS CROSBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Merchant Taylors' Schools Crosby provide education to boys and girls from the ages 4-18, in two Senior Schools, two Junior Schools and a Mixed Infant School. With the exception of pupils aged 4-7 and a small amount of teaching in the sixth form, the Schools provide a single sex education. There is however a wide range of extra-curricular activities in which both boys and girls can participate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£15,902,930
Donations and legacies | £489.15k | |
Charitable activities | £14.88m | |
Other trading activities | £144.85k | |
Investments | £306.14k | |
Other | £86.29k |
Total expenditure:
£16,353,901
Raising funds | £116.69k | |
Charitable activities | £16.14m | |
Other | £101.90k |
£719,921 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £218.59k | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.14m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £218.59k | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.14m | |
Retained for future use | £268.95k |
People

244 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wigan
- Wirral
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew King | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Alexander Quartermain | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony O'Brien | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE FLETCHER | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Richard Mawdsley | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Elizabeth Fay | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Sinclair | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Stuart Green | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Steen Johnston | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Marshall KC | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manoj Agarwal | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Cowling | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Anna Gabriella Gervasoni | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.91m | £14.99m | £15.79m | £16.72m | £15.90m | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.44m | £14.67m | £16.11m | £16.36m | £16.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £234.94k | £60.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £326.63k | £40.00k | £96.04k | £462.65k | £489.15k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £100.17k | £133.00k | £145.14k | £155.59k | £144.85k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £15.23m | £14.05m | £15.15m | £15.69m | £14.88m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £40.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £307.64k | £349.26k | £349.33k | £306.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £259.69k | £459.63k | £45.92k | £65.34k | £86.29k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £105.37k | £300.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £16.27m | £14.55m | £15.95m | £16.19m | £16.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £165.97k | £75.84k | £86.74k | £96.46k | £116.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £119.34k | £90.13k | £62.67k | £54.03k | £51.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £50.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £41.14k | £74.07k | £69.47k | £101.90k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £25.46m | £15.66m | £15.85m | £17.59m | £26.48m | |
|
Long-term investments | £180.00k | £12.80m | £11.96m | £9.67m | £837.73k | |
|
Other assets | £5.73m | £2.82m | £3.32m | £3.71m | £3.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.42m | £1.60m | £2.31m | £2.75m | £2.01m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JULY 2008 as amended on 13 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (OBJECTS) FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY: THE PROVISION OF DAY AND/OR BOARDING SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN OR NEAR CROSBY WHICH SHALL SUBJECT TO BELOW INCLUDE INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY POLICY SET BY THE GOVERNORS FROM TIME TO TIME, ANY PUPIL MAY BE EXEMPTED FROM INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
CROSBY
Linked charities
- BROCK PRIZE FUND
- CANON ARMOUR READING PRIZE FUND
- CRADDOCK-WATSON PRIZE FUND
- CROSTEKER PRIZE FUND
- CYNTHIA SMITH PRIZE FUND
- DAVIES PRIZE FUND
- DAWBARN MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- DERBY PRIZE FUND
- DR JOSEPH G G CORKHILL FUND
- ERIC BROCK MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- FORDHAM PRIZE FUND
- FRIENDS OF MERCHANT TAYLORS' SCHOOL CROSBY
- GALE PRIZE FUND
- GAMES FUND
- JACKSON MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- JUBILEE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- LONGFORD GREEK PRIZE FUND
- LONGFORD LATIN PRIZE FUND
- LONGFORD PRIZE FUND
- MELLER PRIZE FUND
- MERCHANT TAYLORS' SCHOOLS OF THE FOUNDATION OF JOHN HARRISON TRUST
- MILTON MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- MONTEFIORE PRIZE FUND
- MORTIMER PRIZE FUND
- R EMRYS JONES LECTURE TRUST FUND
- SHEPHERD EASTWOOD PRIZE FUND
- SIMMONDS CRICKET PRIZE FUND
- SIR HENRY LUCY SCHOLARSHIP FUND SOLDIERS CLUB
- SNIGGERY SCHOLARSHIPS FUND
- THE MITCHELL PRIZE FOR ENGLISH
- THE TEMPLE ROBERTS MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- THOMPSON PRIZE FUND
- TYLER PRIZE FUND
- VIEHOFF PRIZE FUND
- W E RICHARDS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- WOODWARD PRIZE FUND
- WOODWARD PRIZE FUND ( GIRLS SCHOOL)
- 22 September 2008 : Standard registration
- 29 April 2009 : Removed
- 29 April 2009 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
186 LIVERPOOL ROAD
CROSBY
LIVERPOOL
L23 0QP
- Phone:
- 01519499325
- Email:
- cosec@merchanttaylors.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window