RODE HEATH YOUNG PEOPLE'S COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YOUNG PEOPLE'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 16 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ellis | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
PAUL MARTIN GOODBY | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
GUY BONDON COOKE | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
SAMUEL JOHN BARBER | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
STUART JAMES MOSELEY | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN COSGROVE | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN MARK WORRALL | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
BERNARD MOSELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
CHARLES BIGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOHN SPENCER DAVIES FCA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.45k | £22.65k | £11.00k | £8.03k | £12.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.88k | £9.82k | £15.58k | £10.92k | £9.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.60k | £19.37k | £2.67k | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO PROVIDE A YOUNG PEOPLE'S COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF RODE HEATH ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND FOR FUNCTIONS AND ACTIVITIES IN CONNECTION THEREWITH AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PURPOSES OF HELPING AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS OF EITHER SEX THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
RODE HEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Sycamore Avenue
Rode Heath
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST7 3SF
- Phone:
- 07767603604
- Email:
- Cozzy64@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window