THE SIR FRANCIS PEMBERTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity uses the donations it receives to make grants to other charitable organisations for medical, education and sport purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tana Pemberton | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr FOAD ROUHANI | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY WINGATE PEMBERTON | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.27k | £300.94k | £35.37k | £39.17k | £38.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.67k | £136.41k | £67.71k | £32.81k | £43.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 15 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH A MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH MEDICAL OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE WIDEST SENSE (PROVIDED THAT SUCH OBJECTS AND PURPOSES ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITOL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME AN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRUMPINGTON ENTERPRISES LTD
MARIS LANE
TRUMPINGTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 9LE
- Phone:
- 01223840840
- Email:
- jeremy@conosco.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window